THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALDINGBOURNE BARNHAM AND EASTERGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religeous assemblies in schools. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALDINGBOURNE BARNHAM AND EASTERGATE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Richard Armstead | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Margaret Nichol | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Holder | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Victor Mouque | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Rosemary Lambourn | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Wells | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Linda Angrave | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Tripp | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|||||
LESLEY BRYANT | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN STAPLETON | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE REEVES | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev GRAHAM REEVES | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY CAMERER CUSS | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARY COURTNADGE | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW DUNLOP | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER HIGGINS | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEvEN RICHARD MAPLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRADLEY FRANCIS SMITH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.47k | £135.61k | £148.41k | £165.17k | £164.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.22k | £124.70k | £162.20k | £149.77k | £164.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARISH OFFICE
35 BARNHAM ROAD
BARNHAM
BOGNOR REGIS
PO22 0ER
- Phone:
- 01243553955
- Email:
- parishofabe@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window