ROOTS NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Roots Nursery School provides free nursery aged education in The Gambia, West Africa. It is our goal to remove children from poverty through education
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- The Gambia
Governance
- 07 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Myron Bartlett | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Mardlin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Charles John Errington | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1575 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1 ) TO DEVELOP THE ROOTS NURSERY SCHOOL TO ENSURE THE AVAILABILITY OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO STAFF AND STUDENTS 2) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND OTHER NECESSARY SUPPORT TO ITS STUDENTS, STAFF AND FAMILIES 3) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO FORMER PUPILS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR ONGOING EDUCATION AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT 4) TO MAKE SUPPORT AVAILABLE TO OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE GAMBIA TO ENABLE THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION 5) TO RELIEVE POVERTY HERE WE BELIEVE IT IMPACTS STUDENTS EDUCATION
Area of benefit
THE ROOTS NURSERY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 CHENNELLS CLOSE
HITCHIN
SG4 0EA
- Phone:
- 01462600107
- Email:
- info@rootsnurseryschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window