Financial history ADEYFIELD FREE CHURCH HEMEL HEMPSTEAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1131868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £184.31k £107.72k £141.32k £111.93k £213.44k
Total expenditure £197.92k £108.45k £107.19k £110.09k £183.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A