ADEYFIELD FREE CHURCH HEMEL HEMPSTEAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES WITH ALL AGES SUPPORT OF THE ELDERLY IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY SUPPORT OF CHRISTIAN MISSION WORKERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Jacqueline Davis | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Grimsdale | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Karel Stein | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Kerry | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Stuart | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Annison | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ford | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARY LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.31k | £107.72k | £141.32k | £111.93k | £213.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.92k | £108.45k | £107.19k | £110.09k | £183.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) 18/05/2009
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adeyfield Free Church Centre
Maylands Avenue
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP2 4GZ
- Phone:
- 01442260175
- Email:
- admin@adeyfieldfree.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window