Financial history NEW NORTH ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, HUDDERSFIELD

Charity Number: 1131496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £99.75k £247.92k £247.92k £65.08k £76.89k
Total expenditure £87.91k £93.79k £154.13k £86.67k £97.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A