Parochial Church Council of Capel and Ockley

Charity number: 1132153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £143,770
Total expenditure: £139,464

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 13 May 2015: Funds received from 252535 ANNIE BRIANT-POLLEY TRUST
  • 25 February 2016: Funds received from 311955 CLARE EMMA COWPER BROWN, FOR SUNDAY SCHOOL
  • 26 February 2016: Funds received from 242050 CHARITY OF LADY HARRIET ELIZA DANVERS HARRISON
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • OCKLEY,OAKWOOD AND FOREST GREEN PCC (Working name)
  • PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OCKLEY AND CAPEL (Previous name)
  • PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OCKLEY, OAKWOOD AND FOREST GREEN. (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hon Gillian Mary Christie Trustee 03 April 2022
OKEWOOD, FOREST GREEN AND OCKLEY AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, OCKLEY
Received: On time
James Charles Innes Lee-Steere Trustee 25 January 2021
OCKLEY PAROCHIAL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, OCKLEY
Received: On time
Leigh Smith Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Suzanne Lorraine Cole Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Wendy Goddard Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Norman James Ede Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Sarah Winifred Pusey Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Jessie Margaret Stuart Sutcliffe Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Andrew Jonathan Carr Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
David Dennis Silliman Trustee 01 January 2019
FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, CAPEL
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
CHARLOTTE BROADWOOD TRUST
Received: On time
Elizabeth Rosalind Richardson Trustee 01 January 2019
OCKLEY UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOY DIANA HARMAN Trustee 01 January 2019
FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, CAPEL
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
Shirley Dean-Webster Trustee 10 March 2013
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, OCKLEY
Received: On time
GORDON ERNEST LEE-STEERE Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, OCKLEY
Received: On time
HELEN MARGARET BURT Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, OCKLEY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £177.25k £132.39k £119.71k £139.41k £143.77k
Total expenditure £177.28k £145.99k £116.74k £125.39k £139.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.06k £1.25k £1.25k £1.25k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 The Street
Capel
DORKING
Surrey
RH5 5LE
Phone:
01306 711260