East Mercia Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit supports 12 churches by encouraging the churches to work together, by providing training for lay members and by providing youth workers. This support and leadership enables the following activities. Regular public acts of worship. The teaching of Christianity. Pastoral work. Promotion of the whole mission of the church. Supporting other charities financially and with prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£2,566,636
Donations and legacies | £38.92k | |
Charitable activities | £431.85k | |
Other trading activities | £24.89k | |
Investments | £20.69k | |
Other | £2.05m |
Total expenditure:
£763,925
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £763.93k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £763.93k | |
Retained for future use | £1.80m |
People

15 Employee(s)
53 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 16 January 2023: Funds received from 1135378 KETTERING & CORBY METHODIST CIRCUIT
- RUGBY AND DAVENTRY METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
53 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nathan Stuart Falla | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Brian Hutton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian Francis Basson | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hone | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Greenaway | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Burt | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Brierley | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Ebenezeer Amo-Baiden | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ernest Peter Muir | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Trevor John Robert Thomas | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MILDRED WENDY CURTIS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ruth Cross | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Candlin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alison Frances Tomlin BA, BD | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Susan Clarkson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID RAYMOND TOMLIN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wooliscroft | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ada-June Kusogbo | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAT BASSON | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Edward Robert Piper | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Noel Nhariswa | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
June Marilyn Calvert | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
HELEN DAVINA GREEN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Thomas Murphy | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ann Hadkiss | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Shuker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Rice | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
ANN WINDOW | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Anne Heinink | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Arthur | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID ARNOLD | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pauline Walters | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Huntington | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Margaret Tomkins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ROBERT DEANS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lynn Blackhurst | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard John Warrener | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hawkins | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Lindsay Over | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEACON GEORGINA MARY BROOKS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTINE ANNE DYBDAHL | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN MARGETTS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARGARET GLENN CERT ED | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Price | Trustee | 30 May 2014 |
|
|||||
REV DAVID PAUL COLLINSON | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MR IAIN RENNIE | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Elizabeth Gaffney | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER LAMONT GREENAWAY RIBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFFREY PAUL WELLS BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK JAMES TOOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ANNE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANNE BRIERLEY BA CERT ED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.56k | £238.51k | £211.16k | £237.21k | £2.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.54k | £253.72k | £216.16k | £252.17k | £763.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.92k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.89k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £431.85k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.69k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.05m | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £763.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £669.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £94.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.42m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £765.00k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £754.29k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £67.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rugby Methodist Church Centre
Russelsheim Way
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV22 7TB
- Phone:
- 07985 308637
- Email:
- methodistcircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window