Financial history ST GEORGES UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HEMEL HEMPSTEAD

Charity number: 1131706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.23k £52.82k £47.91k £82.46k £72.98k
Total expenditure £82.13k £63.68k £67.33k £46.12k £50.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A