Financial history THE PAROCHAIL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SILAS THE MARTYR & HOLY TRINITY WITH ST BARNABAS KENTISH TOWN

Charity number: 1131736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £209.01k £159.06k £179.35k £166.70k £172.33k
Total expenditure £197.49k £162.32k £146.53k £154.56k £161.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A