THE PAROCHAIL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SILAS THE MARTYR & HOLY TRINITY WITH ST BARNABAS KENTISH TOWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religous activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 22 September 2009: Standard registration
- PARISH OF ST SILAS AND HOLY TRINITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PHILIP CORBETT | Chair | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graeme Rowlands | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Goddard | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Stinson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Maureen Chisholm | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Coreen Ophelia Sylvilyn Hamed | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Maude Barnett | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN JULIA GODDARD | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
marlene elise anodu | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN SHARPE | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BOWMAN | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN HODGMAN | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALVYN LINGE | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW LEE | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARABELLA MARY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.01k | £159.06k | £179.35k | £166.70k | £172.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.49k | £162.32k | £146.53k | £154.56k | £161.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2020 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2020 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ACT OF PARLIAMENT
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Silas Presbytery
11 St. Silas Place
London
NW5 3QP
- Phone:
- 02074853727
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window