Trustees THE PAROCHAIL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SILAS THE MARTYR & HOLY TRINITY WITH ST BARNABAS KENTISH TOWN
Charity number: 1131736

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PHILIP CORBETT | Chair | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graeme Rowlands | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Goddard | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Stinson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Maureen Chisholm | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Coreen Ophelia Sylvilyn Hamed | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Maude Barnett | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN JULIA GODDARD | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
marlene elise anodu | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN SHARPE | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BOWMAN | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN HODGMAN | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALVYN LINGE | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW LEE | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARABELLA MARY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.