Financial history BORTH FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 1136393
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £46.89k £56.22k £93.28k £52.49k £42.33k
Total expenditure £33.13k £67.31k £71.10k £80.10k £61.61k
Income from government contracts £6.00k £0 £0 £4.72k N/A
Income from government grants £1.81k £52.62k £2.25k N/A £3.13k