Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ELSTREE AND BOREHAMWOOD

Charity number: 1132871
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £106.03k £95.81k £74.96k £73.50k £118.67k
Total expenditure £101.70k £127.51k £62.74k £68.06k £109.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A