Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ELSTREE AND BOREHAMWOOD
Charity number: 1132871

Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Louise Collins | Chair | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dyer | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alana Leigh Davenport | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Silvera | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAZLYN HAZEL | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol McKee | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Auton | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Pam Kubica | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
MELITA LEE | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA IRIS CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANNE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.