THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, NOTTINGHAM

Charity Number: 1133724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promotion of the Christian faith through church and community based activities. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £49,766
Total expenditure: £60,531

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST ANDREW'S PCC, NOTTINGHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Wreford Trustee 16 September 2024
SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Amy Hughes Trustee 16 September 2024
THE ORCHARD WOMEN
Recently registered
Charlie Palmer Trustee 12 June 2024
TRINITY CHURCH NOTTINGHAM
Rashmi Mohan Trustee 12 June 2024
TRINITY CHURCH NOTTINGHAM
Eleanor Dawn Wreford Trustee 10 May 2023
TRINITY CHURCH NOTTINGHAM
Kirsten Chung Trustee 10 May 2023
TRINITY CHURCH NOTTINGHAM
Adam Jones Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Rev Jonathan William Llewelyn Hughes Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Fraser John Angus Bell Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Amelia Watkins-Smith Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Edward Michael Astley-Arlington Trustee 10 May 2023
KEFRAMA SCHOOL BUILD
Received: On time
Linda Patricia Bignall Trustee 10 May 2023
ST ANDREW'S PARISH HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Ruth Naomi Lancastle Clarkson Webb Trustee 16 May 2021
TRINITY CHURCH NOTTINGHAM
Benjamin Leonard Waymark Trustee 30 June 2020
ST ANDREW'S PARISH HALL TRUST
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH NOTTINGHAM

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £60.00k £61.51k £56.67k £76.64k £49.77k
Total expenditure £44.76k £38.26k £105.17k £84.30k £60.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Trinity Church Nottingham
192-194 Mansfield Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 3HX
Phone:
01159622665