THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS BURBAGE IN THE DIOCESE OF SALISBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity. Religious assemblies in schools. Promotion of Christianity through events meetings and literature. Promoting mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens parents and toddlers and other groups. Supporting charities in UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ALL SAINTS BURBAGE WILTSHIRE (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev COLIN MICHAEL HEBER-PERCY | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Clare Gordon | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
THELMA MAISIE HENDERSON | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Handley | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERESA JOAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE KENNINGTON | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Claire Seaward | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
JANET SUSAN HARTWELL | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER DAVIS | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE WILLIAM GORDON | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JO REID | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV MICHAEL THOMAS MCHUGH | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOY NANCY GUY | Trustee | 10 September 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.48k | £64.11k | £94.89k | £97.99k | £111.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.14k | £80.17k | £94.10k | £98.92k | £111.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH CENTRE
26 Eastcourt
Burbage
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 3AG
- Phone:
- 01672810853
- Email:
- clergy@savernaketeam.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window