THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OTTERY ST MARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick lonely and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons courses and small groups. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens parents and toddlers and other special needs groups. Support for UK and overseas charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 11 November 2016: Funds received from 306740 REVEREND GEORGE COLERIDGE'S (IVY COTTAGE) CHARITY
- OTTERY ST MARY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Clayton | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melloney Rose O'Brien-Kaye | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anitra Lockwood | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Simmonds | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Everett | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Rix | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ruth Duffy | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie McIntosh | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lydia Margaret Sheelagh Cook | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Clayton | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Maybery | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.36k | £121.43k | £113.19k | £133.43k | £180.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.75k | £123.26k | £108.91k | £119.28k | £119.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ottery St. Mary Parish Church
Paternoster Row
OTTERY ST. MARY
Devon
EX11 1DP
- Phone:
- 01404 814573
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window