Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARTIN OF TOURS, RUISLIP

Charity Number: 1132848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julien Ng Fuk Chong Trustee 29 April 2025
None on record
Mervyn Hogg Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Nicola Brazier Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Deborah Anne Nicholes Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Diane Louise Bell Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
PETER DAVID HOLMES GOLBY Trustee 23 May 2023
1ST AMERSHAM COMMON (ST GEORGE'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Miranda Jane Reading Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Peter Trott Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Rev Robert Bertram Chapman Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Christopher Gareth White Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Vivien Sheila Morris Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
CATHERINE TUGNAIT Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Kenneth Wild Trustee 15 March 2022
ORCHYD
Received: On time
Susan Hammond Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Mary Elaine Coulthurst Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Danny Nicolaas William Dartnaill Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Jacqueline May Alderton Trustee 19 December 2021
None on record
SARAH JACOB Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Ruth Bitok Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Judith Mary Kaplan Trustee 01 May 2015
None on record