TORCH HELP HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Torch Help Hub (Torch) is run by volunteers from local churches to provide a helping hand to those who otherwise cannot get help and tend to fall through the gaps of existing support or provision. We offer a wide range of free personal and practical help as well as signposting to other organisations that we work in partnership with in our town as we seek to love our neighbours as Jesus commands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 11 September 2009: Standard registration
- READING CHRISTIAN NETWORK (Previous name)
- Transform Reading (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Salmon | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Kenneth Horne | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Daniel Dwelly | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE JOHN HOLLANDS | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|||||
John Davies | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.05k | £84.90k | £82.33k | £117.20k | £19.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.51k | £72.61k | £75.95k | £125.51k | £96.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £15.80k | £13.86k | £20.80k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.80k | £5.00k | £15.00k | £18.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 2009 as amended on 03 Jul 2019 as amended on 10 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN READING AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE 0001ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO AGE, SICKNESS OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH PARTS OF, THE UK AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREYFRIARS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
64 FRIAR STREET
READING
RG1 1EH
- Phone:
- 0118 380 0260
- Email:
- office@torchhelphub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window