THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN MEADS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To ensure opportunities for worship are provided for all ages of the community; To maintain the fabric entrusted to the PCC; To maintain links with the wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 11 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, MEADS, EASTBOURNE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV GILES MICHAEL GERARD CARPENTER | Chair | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Murray | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Peat | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Christopher Mottram | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Scott-Biggs | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charles Geoffrey Burley | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Eunice Jean Glover | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Glover | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Jackson | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Clare Howarth | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas Pinder | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clement Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Marian Stone | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL SCOTT-RALPHS | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Scott-Ralphs | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CATHERINE HASSELL | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN WILLIAM CAROE | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE FIONA BUTCHER | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JORJ KOWSZUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.55k | £330.50k | £328.96k | £227.00k | £277.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.94k | £248.76k | £291.60k | £255.46k | £266.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Johns Church
11 St Johns Road
Eastbourne
East Sussex
BN20 7ND
- Phone:
- 01323 738671
- Email:
- treasurer@stjm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window