Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN MEADS
Charity number: 1131574
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV GILES MICHAEL GERARD CARPENTER | Chair | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND HASSELL | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Scott-Biggs | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Jean Glover | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charles Geoffrey Burley | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Hammond | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Glover | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Gibson | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Clare Howarth | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Jackson | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas Pinder | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Marian Stone | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clement Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID MICHAEL SCOTT-RALPHS | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Scott-Ralphs | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CATHERINE HASSELL | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN WILLIAM CAROE | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE FIONA BUTCHER | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JORJ KOWSZUN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.