Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WAREHAM
Charity Number: 1132868

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Margaret Duncan | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Levett | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elmes | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Harris | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Selwood | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Laking | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Anthony Kelly | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Swann | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hilary Rowenna Bond | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Tew | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Spurling | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Selby | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Collings | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lewis Lawrence Lapper | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Henry Quinlan | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Hilary Goodinge | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Barbara Wells | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nick Burden | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Joyce Green | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon George Lathwell | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Barclay | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN FRANK MOULTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.