MS THERAPY CENTRE, NORFOLK LTD

Charity Number: 1131940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of a centre to provide therapies and help to those suffering from neurological conditions, particularly multiple sclerosis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £110,255
Total expenditure: £145,088

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 September 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ILC (Working name)
  • INDEPENDENT LIFE CENTRE NORWICH LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernard Elwen Chair 01 August 2013
None on record
Suzanne Carroll Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Sheridin Bridewell Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £106.82k £132.15k £117.26k £137.46k £110.26k
Total expenditure £121.48k £150.83k £141.91k £131.26k £145.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 24 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 14 November 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 14 November 2023 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 04 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Hurricane Way
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR6 6EZ
Phone:
01603 488561