Financial history OLDHAM CENTRAL MASJID & ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1133257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £372.63k £487.83k £486.38k £529.39k £492.79k
Total expenditure £278.44k £338.61k £374.10k £380.18k £442.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.81k £16.36k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £293.53k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £162.65k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £73.21k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £201.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £179.19k N/A