THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, PLAISTOW, BROMLEY, DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Mary's has a lively congregational life expressed in a central tradition. The congregation has a great variety of people and interests. During the year there were 2 baptisms, 0 weddings & 10 funerals. Most activities restricted by Covid have now resumed and online recordings of services also continue to be popular. The church celebrated its 160th birthday in September 2023.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
Governance
- 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S PLAISTOW PCC, BROMLEY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Clements | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Rebecca Chance | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Samuel Beale | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Natalie Staines MPHARM | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthia Margaret Page | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clement Llewellyn Sutton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Carol Morris | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alison Ruth Tyler | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sand Hevezi | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JILL ELIZABETH ATKINSON | Trustee | 01 May 1989 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.96k | £158.56k | £176.01k | £168.67k | £200.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227.58k | £168.58k | £171.65k | £164.85k | £157.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS CHURCH
61 COLLEGE ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 3QG
- Phone:
- 020 8466 6969
- Email:
- stmarysbromley@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window