SHOCKOUT ACADEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 30 November 2009: Standard registration
- 09 January 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 February 2012: Re-registered
- 04 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.94k | £250.02k | £376.80k | £368.45k | £355.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.19k | £824.71k | £300.69k | £185.57k | £356.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1) EXISTS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 7 TO 25 THROUGH AN INCLUSIVE PROGRAM UNITING PERFORMING ARTS; DRAMA, DANCE, PERFORMANCE SKILLS AND SINGING DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF FIFE: 2) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 7 TO 25 BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS G MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS;
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE. LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window