WARE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ware U3A, has over 70 groups ranging from Bowls, Outings, Churches, Tai Chi, theatre, tennis, wildlife, to handicrafts, walking, ambling, singing and so many more interest groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Mizen | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abi Anson | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Mizen | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mabel Mendonca | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rudgley | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hardy | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Westgate | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Pullinger | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Pullinger | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELLEN DAVIS | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Hammond | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Walker | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.71k | £21.08k | £15.11k | £19.01k | £16.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.41k | £12.58k | £23.85k | £22.15k | £18.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2014 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 14 Apr 2021 as amended on 13 Apr 2022 as amended on 13 Apr 2022 as amended on 13 Apr 2022 as amended on 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN WARE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
WARE AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Chadwell
WARE
Hertfordshire
SG12 9LD
- Phone:
- 01920412432
- Email:
- treas@wareu3a.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window