Trustees WARE U3A
Charity Number: 1132216

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Mizen | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abi Anson | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Mizen | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mabel Mendonca | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rudgley | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hardy | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Westgate | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Pullinger | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Pullinger | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELLEN DAVIS | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Hammond | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Walker | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.