THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PAUL'S ROYTON

Charity Number: 1131589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £101,780
Total expenditure: £92,989

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. PAUL'S PCC, ROYTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Father Graham Hollowood Chair 02 September 2018
None on record
Maureen Dickens Trustee 08 April 2018
None on record
Roy Turner Trustee 08 April 2018
None on record
JOANNE BERRY Trustee 03 April 2016
None on record
Constance Heslop Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Patricia Gulliver Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BARNES Trustee 10 September 2011
None on record
ADELE BERESFORD-GRINDROD Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
RACHEL HELME Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
SANDRA SCHOFIELD Trustee
None on record
BARRY BARNES Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY DEREK HAWKINS Trustee
None on record
KATHLEEN BRIGGS Trustee
None on record
DAVID ANTONY MULLIN Trustee
SPRINGBOARD - OLDHAM DEMENTIA CARERS GROUP
Received: On time
PETER HOWARD SCHOFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £122.59k £79.99k £72.00k £102.20k £101.78k
Total expenditure £119.32k £86.23k £75.00k £107.94k £92.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
916 OLDHAM ROAD
ROCHDALE
OL11 2BN
Phone:
01706648751
Website:

saint-pauls-royton.org