Trustees SOUTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH EXETER & BRAMPFORD SPEKE
Charity Number: 1133068

Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ross Alexander Maynard | Chair | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Stanley | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Wilcox | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence Bulkeley | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Tania Anne Ingham | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jean Vizard | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Bailey | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Heather Margaret Parkinson | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER CROFT JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.