Financial history SUTTON OPPORTUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1132408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £222.61k £242.85k £230.23k £230.31k £228.59k
Total expenditure £224.65k £234.54k £242.46k £247.84k £278.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £212.21k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £205.37k N/A N/A £208.93k £212.63k