SUTTON OPPORTUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A CHARITY WHICH RUNS A SMALL PRE-SCHOOL WITH 42 PLACES FOR CHILDREN AGES 2 - 5. WE HAVE BEEN IN EXISTENCE FOR 25 YEARS WITH A PHILOSOPHY OF INCLUDING ALL CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, WHATEVER THEIR NEEDS. OUR MOST RECENT OFSTED INSPECTION JUDGED US AS 'OUTSTANDING'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £212,625 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Sutton
Governance
- 29 October 2009: Standard registration
- 30 May 2012: Funds received from 1007177 SUTTON OPPORTUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy-Rebecca Wood | Chair | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Malia | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Heighes | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Francis | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMMA BENDER | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.61k | £242.85k | £230.23k | £230.31k | £228.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.65k | £234.54k | £242.46k | £247.84k | £278.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £212.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £205.37k | N/A | N/A | £208.93k | £212.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/05/2006
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rear of 16-18 Stanley Park Road
Fronting Holmwood Gardens
Wallington
SM6 0EU
- Phone:
- 07494649486
- Email:
- info@suttops.co.uk
- Website:
-
suttops.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window