STONY STRATFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH, (MEMBER OF THE BAPTIST UNION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH SERVICES COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES FOR ELDERLY, PARENTS AND TODDLERS, YOUNG PEOPLE TEACHING AND TRAINING IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MISSION ACITIVITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS ACTIVITIES RELATED TO POVERTY AND INJUSTICE IN UK AND OVERSEAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 23 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stuart Earl | Chair | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Halsey | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARY BOWDEN | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Laughlan | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alec Whybray | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Howson | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Anthony Summerfield | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY HOWSON | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zara Lee | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Hughes | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.90k | £208.54k | £176.85k | £178.23k | £148.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.89k | £179.53k | £173.66k | £190.37k | £111.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STONY STRATFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH
HORSEFAIR GREEN
STONY STRATFORD
MILTON KEYNES
MK11 1JW
- Phone:
- 01908567168
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window