SHOMRIM SAFETY PATROL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded by Community activist Mr Efrayim Goldstein in 2005. Shomrim has 50 volunteers, 24-hour emergency hotline & Centre.In its first 5 months of operation, the hotline received 2,000 calls While police figures previously showed Stamford Hill to have the lowest crime rate in the borough, the presence of Shomrim revealed that crime was being underreported by the largely Yiddish-speaking community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 22 February 2010: Standard registration
- 24 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHOMRIM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 22 March 2012 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 15 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN LONDON AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME IN THE AREA. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE POLICE, THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM, AND THE PREVENTION OF, CRIMINAL ACTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window