THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of spiritual support to the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,403 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST WILFRID'S PCC, KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KEVIN CHARLES | Chair | 19 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Nicola Walker | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Bowen | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thea Avison | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Charles | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dora-Leigh Chadwick | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Richard Vardy | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN HURT | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH HILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LESLIE BALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.07k | £64.71k | £74.75k | £82.06k | £122.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.67k | £53.45k | £56.42k | £107.92k | £72.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.33k | N/A | £1.33k | £1.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 WESTMINSTER AVENUE
KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD
NOTTINGHAM
NG17 7HY
- Phone:
- 01623723939
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window