THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, WOLLASTON

Charity Number: 1133799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £111,063
Total expenditure: £116,899

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Diana Farmer Chair 11 April 2022
THE MATTHEW L. WEBB PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
Rev Carol Weston Trustee 13 August 2023
None on record
Diana Hemmings Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
John Nicholson Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Linda Kathryn Button Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Janet Susan Tribbel Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Brian Dudley Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Atanas Rosenov Yordanov Trustee 29 March 2015
None on record
Richard Ernest Green Trustee 03 April 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £127.13k £86.59k £101.04k £132.48k £111.06k
Total expenditure £156.83k £138.08k £147.46k £131.38k £116.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. James Church Hall
Belfry Drive
Wollaston
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 3SE
Phone:
01384 441277
Website:

No information available