Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOCKPORT, ST GEORGE
Charity number: 1134170

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Neilson | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Brown | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Davenport | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lucy Whitehouse | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lilla Ann Clark | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Margaret Clark | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mantle | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Margaret Crook | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Waters | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rachel Anne Vandyes | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Susan McKAy | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FRANCES BURT | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lois Kelly | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marion Cordingley | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Roy Hibbert | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROGER HARDY | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr ANDREW CHARLES REGAN | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Hazel Jenkins | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.