THOMAS HARLEY'S ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 500537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity grant aids the Thomas Harley Educational Foundation and the Thomas Harley Charity for Widows of Clergymen. The educational foundation awards grants to schools and young persons from the preferred area of benefit, defined as the villages of Osgathorpe & Belton (Leicestershire) and the former urban district of Coalville. The widows of clergy are mainly from the Leicester diocese and gran

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £320,180
Total expenditure: £242,358

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY OF THOMAS HARLEY (ESTATE CHARITY) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Hackwood Chair 17 September 2013
THOMAS HARLEY'S CHARITY
Recently registered
Andrew James Dodson Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Rev ANTHONY ROBERT LEIGHTON Trustee 09 May 2023
THOMAS HARLEY'S CHARITY
Recently registered
WYGGESTON SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rosemary Ann Gibson Trustee 09 May 2023
THOMAS HARLEY'S CHARITY
Recently registered
Christopher John Sheldon Trustee 26 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL LOUGHBOROUGH
Received: On time
THE LEICESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THOMAS HARLEY'S CHARITY
Recently registered
Peter Sergeant Trustee 16 November 2018
THOMAS HARLEY'S CHARITY
Recently registered
CHRISTINE RADFORD Trustee
THOMAS HARLEY'S CHARITY
Recently registered
THE BERNARD THORPE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £285.38k £297.96k £296.10k £314.02k £320.18k
Total expenditure £207.23k £244.10k £223.05k £257.47k £242.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF AUGUST 1990 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION ( MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 14 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
PROVIDING FOR KING EDWARD VII COLLEGE OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL, SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE PARISHES OF OSGATHORPE AND BELTON, AND FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF COALVILLE, SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITY. B) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE, AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF OSGATHORPE AND BELTON, AND FORMER URBAN DISTRICT.
Registration history
  • 10 May 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
CHARITY LINK
20A MILLSTONE LANE
LEICESTER
LE1 5JN
Phone:
0116 222 2210