THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN BAPTIST BROUGHTON

Charity Number: 1134595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary object of the PCC is the promotion of the Gospel of Our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £289,236
Total expenditure: £271,693

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF BROUGHTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev FLEUR ESTELLE GREEN Chair 18 October 2021
DANIEL'S AND HOUGHTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BROUGHTON-IN-PRESTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAMARIS DIXON
Received: On time
THE BLACKBURN DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
MICHAEL DAVID ANSON Trustee 25 April 2022
BROUGHTON-IN-PRESTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Patricia Anne Brand Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Carol Yvonne Marquis Buckley Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
BRENDAN HURLEY Trustee 07 April 2014
DAMARIS DIXON
Received: On time
MARILYN COUPER Trustee
None on record
KATHLEEN MORRIS BSC HONS Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN COUPER Trustee
None on record
BARRY ARTHUR TOWNSEND Trustee
None on record
PETER GEOFFREY WARD Trustee
None on record
JIM TITTERINGTON Trustee
None on record
CANON ANDREA FARE TITTERINGTON BA MA MCIH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £158.18k £99.43k £130.99k £167.29k £289.24k
Total expenditure £157.94k £44.72k £76.99k £105.17k £271.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
410 Garstang Road
Broughton
Preston
PR3 5JB
Phone:
01772862330