THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALVESTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spreading of the Gospel in the local Parish and beyond. Outreach work to youth and others in the Parish and from elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 17 July 2018: Funds received from 1103951 FRIENDS OF THE OLD CHURCH, ALVESTON
- PARISH OF ALVESTON, ST JAMES' WITH ST PETER'S, MANOR ROAD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Elizabeth Dixon | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Linda Karen McDermott | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard William Lucas | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Diane Kemp | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lucas | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon John Richardson | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Richardson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kiri Harbottle | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lane | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Trevor Llod-Adams | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Neil Johnson Dr | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH ONEAL COTON | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Joseph Johnston | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIETTE CLAIRE DALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.31k | £153.64k | £102.75k | £105.44k | £142.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.16k | £111.29k | £119.00k | £114.74k | £206.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.21k | £707 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Kineton Road
Wellesbourne
WARWICK
CV35 9LQ
- Phone:
- 07714693999
- Email:
- alvestonpcc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window