THE ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST HELEN OF COLCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are part of the Antiochian Orthodox Archdiocese of The British Isles and Ireland (Greek Orthodox Patriarchate of Antioch). We promote the Orthodox Christian faith as expressed in the Holy Scriptures, the Holy Tradition, the teachings of the seven Ecumenical Councils and the Holy Fathers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALEXANDER ALISTAIR MATTHEW HAIG BD AKC | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicholas Edwin Taylor | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dusan Radunovic | Trustee | 08 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.46k | £83.87k | £63.76k | £25.21k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.13k | £15.16k | £13.04k | £16.24k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 2010 as amended on 24 Mar 2019 as amended on 24 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
A TO PROMOTE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE RITES AND TRADITIONS OF THE ONE HOLY CATHOLIC ORTHODOX AND APOSTOLIC CHURCH AS EXPRESSED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, THE HOLY TRADITION, THE TEACHINGS OF THE SEVEN ECUMENICAL COUNCILS AND THE HOLY FATHERS AND AS PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE GREEK ORTHODOX PATRIARCHATE OF ANTIOCH. B TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN THE COUNTIES OF ESSEX, SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ESSEX, SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 MAIDENBURGH STREET
COLCHESTER
CO1 1UB
- Phone:
- 01206530530
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window