THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY WITH WALTON CARDIFF

Charity number: 1133813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the pastoral, evangelistic, social & ecumenical mission of the Church. Public worship is available & Christianity is taught through sermons,courses & small groups. The Abbey welcomes visitors: offering hospitality, a sacred space for prayer & contemplation. To aid the pastoral work of the Abbey and for the benefit of the community it is vital to maintain Abbey buildings & churchyard.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • TEWKESBURY ABBEY PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nicholas Duff Davies Chair 07 September 2023
THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY FOUNDATION
Elizabeth Swift Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Linda Jeffreys Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Peter Ireland Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Rubin Lee Hart Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Michael David Bristow Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Peter James Smail Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Leslie John Stamp Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Rowan Ireland Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Hildegarde Elizabeth Charman Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Joy Patricia Pegg Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
John Tudor Jeffreys Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Katherine Etherington Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
James Bennett Lancelot Trustee 22 May 2022
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Paul David Charman Trustee 22 May 2022
THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY FOUNDATION
Andrew Thomas Westenborg Maynard Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Nancy Oakes Trustee 30 October 2020
None on record
David Birch Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
Janet Edith Mary Davis Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £996.59k £658.31k £790.90k £867.57k £701.38k
Total expenditure £1.06m £606.72k £827.25k £869.64k £615.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £135.96k £199.15k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £603.58k £592.93k £639.46k £604.06k £519.22k
Income - Other trading activities £327.02k £40.94k £120.38k £221.90k £142.87k
Income - Charitable activities £53.25k £12.58k £19.76k £30.14k £28.29k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.74k £11.86k £11.30k £11.47k £11.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £18.17k £80.54k £5.84k £7.02k £51.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £832.26k £573.48k £792.67k £843.01k £592.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £230.45k £33.24k £34.58k £26.63k £23.46k
Expenditure - Governance £5.14k £5.21k £4.70k £3.97k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.73k £638 £2.50k £6.51k £8.54k
Expenditure - Investment management £4.06k £4.40k £4.47k £4.28k £4.12k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £463.10k £434.99k £416.67k £378.50k £891.85k
Long-term investments £515.42k £508.98k £548.67k £476.11k £515.82k
Other assets £315.61k £398.58k £405.53k £351.52k £355.17k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £131.72k £107.91k £135.38k £47.39k £70.04k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 March 2024 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 March 2024 147 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ABBEY OFFICE
CHURCH STREET
TEWKESBURY
GL20 5RZ
Phone:
01684850959