Accounts and annual returns WEST LEIGH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1132875
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 February 2022 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2022 94 days late
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time