PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALVECHURCH

Charity number: 1131783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at our church and to become part of the parish community of St Laurence. Our services and worship put faith into practice through prayer and scripture, music and sacrament.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £135,775
Total expenditure: £164,537

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST LAURENCE CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Michael Edwards Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Colin Michael Bennett Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Michael Fletcher Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Mark Linton Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Gloria Wilson Trustee 14 May 2023
UP & DOWNS
Received: On time
Michael Davenport Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Susan Nicola Jane Sperring Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Linda Ruth Helmore Trustee 14 May 2023
ALVECHURCH ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Roger Wardle Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Rev Gail Rogers Trustee 03 December 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF REDDITCH HOLY TRINITY
Received: On time
ALVECHURCH EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
WORCESTER YMCA
Received: On time
WORCESTERSHIRE YMCA LIMITED
Received: On time
Sarah Elizabeth Langlands Linton Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Jeremy Peter Freeman Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Sue Lambert Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Lysandre Notley Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Helen Ayling Trustee 23 April 2017
NEURO WALKING FOOTBALL WORCESTERSHIRE
Recently registered
Andrew John Notley Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
SUSAN VALERIE PHILLIPS-WARDLE Trustee
None on record
Dr MARTIN PAUL ALLEN Trustee
FAITH AT WORK IN WORCESTERSHIRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £233.87k £101.80k £127.59k £135.21k £135.78k
Total expenditure £351.44k £116.43k £130.33k £110.91k £164.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
School Lane
ALVECHURCH
BIRMINGHAM
B48 7SB
Phone:
01214477955