SALTAIRE COMMUNITY FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, for the public benefit, the arts, culture and heritage (of Saltaire and its surrounding area), in particular but not exclusively, by promoting and co-ordinating an annual planned programme of arts events within the locality of Saltaire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 22 November 2010: Standard registration
- SALTAIRE FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Henkel | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Bren Travis | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Swailes | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hawarun Hussain | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.92k | £5.03k | £14.79k | £37.49k | £59.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.32k | £14.85k | £21.34k | £39.64k | £57.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | £500 | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4 AUGUST 2009, 6 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 2 NOVEMBER 2010 as amended on 03 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
The charity's objects (the 'Objects') are for the public benefit (residents of, and visitors to, Saltaire) to advance education in the arts and in the heritage of Saltaire and its surrounding area, in particular but not exclusively, by promoting and co-ordinating an annual planned programme of arts events within the locality of Saltaire.
Area of benefit
SALTAIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Bromley Road
SHIPLEY
West Yorkshire
BD18 4DT
- Phone:
- 01274 533819
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window