THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SKIRBECK HOLY TRINITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work,including visiting the sick and bereaved. Provision of a Youth Club with a Christian ethos. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,579 from 1 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC, SKIRBECK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elisabeth Ward | Chair | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thankam Mathews | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur North Hopkins | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Malcolm Grint | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Frank Walker | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Stanley Ward | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moira Goddard | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Acheson | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Tulloch | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Iain Tulloch | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lesley Evelyn Snell | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leila Peel | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elanor Blackburn | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Smith | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Wilkinson | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sola Taiwo | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN PARKINSON | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Percival | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS ABIODUN | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Acheson | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD CHARLES BARKHAM | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.12k | £186.79k | £247.64k | £220.80k | £317.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.11k | £187.81k | £216.83k | £226.01k | £217.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £656 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.60k | N/A | £2.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHURCH OFFICE
SPILSBY ROAD
BOSTON
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE21 9NS
- Phone:
- 01205310221
- Website:
-
holytrintyboston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window