DARTON DARBY AND JOAN CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club is established to provide facilities for recreation or leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life of the community in Darton and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £74 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 18 November 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Bennett | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Hewitt | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kevin Harding | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Waddingham Bennett | Trustee | 01 November 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.02k | £30.74k | £16.75k | £19.16k | £13.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.14k | £12.86k | £21.13k | £17.74k | £12.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £22.79k | N/A | N/A | £74 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1970
Charitable objects
THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE OLD PEOPLE IN DARTON URBAN DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
DARTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 OVERDALE ROAD
WOMBWELL
BARNSLEY
S73 0RN
- Phone:
- 07710224143
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window