Financial history OADBY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1132009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £120.62k £113.88k £131.38k £427.45k £136.44k
Total expenditure £117.05k £99.14k £130.95k £105.06k £127.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A