Trustees OADBY BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1132009

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Hanson | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chris Smith | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mason | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Swan | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Jones | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tom Cox | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK JONES | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.