PCC CHILWELL

Charity number: 1134214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC supports the work of the Anglican Church in the parish of Chilwell

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH CHILWELL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andy Tufnell Chair 31 October 2017
None on record
John Gibbon Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Andrew Beckham Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Tom Ringrose Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Ruth Hawley Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Claire Tufnell Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Ryan Mellor Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Will Ottewell Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Guy Gillibrand Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Robert Dixon Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Roger Lee Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Rebekah Redwood Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Deborah Onions Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Dawn Philippa Clarke Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
Mr Tim Hills Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
Mr Chris Brignell Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
Judith Renton Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
Anne Willmot Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
Dawn Pringle Trustee 14 October 2010
None on record
PENELOPE WALLACE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £341.15k £287.14k £315.19k £484.75k £629.81k
Total expenditure £309.78k £305.93k £304.76k £322.23k £434.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.96k £2.93k N/A £10.58k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £514.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.55k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £83.50k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £510
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.65k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £198.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £434.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £470.69k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £492.85k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Christ Church
Parish Office
6 College Road
Beeston
NOTTINGHAM
Phone:
0115 922 2928